UT HB0368 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Presumption of Workers' Compensation Benefits for Law Enforcement Officers
Title
Presumption of Workers' Compensation Benefits for Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 30 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 30 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 30 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 30 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 30 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |