UT HB0361 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Block Grant Funding and Statutory Exemption Program for Public Education
Title
Block Grant Funding and Statutory Exemption Program for Public Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Education Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Held in House Education Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Education Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Education Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |