UT HB0350 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments Related to Alcohol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments Related to Alcohol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in HFILE
2013-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-14SenateSenate/ to House in SSEC
2013-03-14HouseSenate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2013-03-04SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-03-04SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-03-04HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in HCON
2013-02-28HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HCON
2013-02-28HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in HSTBUS
2013-02-27HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS
2013-02-27HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS
2013-02-27HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS
2013-02-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTBUS
2013-02-25HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2013-02-25HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2013-02-25HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2013-02-21HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-21HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-02-20 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-02-20 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback