UT HB0341 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Birth Certificate Amendments
Title
Birth Certificate Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-14 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill Substituted by Sponsor in House Rules Comm from # 0 to # 1 in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Archives and Records
Department of Government Operations
Department of Health
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Vital Statistics
Department of Government Operations
Department of Health
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Vital Statistics
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |