UT HB0340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Assault Victim Protocols
Title
Sexual Assault Victim Protocols
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-25 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-22 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-19 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTJUD | |
2010-02-16 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2010-02-12 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-11 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |