UT HB0334 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Needs Training for Law Enforcement Amendments
Title
Special Needs Training for Law Enforcement Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-12 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Human Services
Human Services
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Services for People with Disabilities
Human Services
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Services for People with Disabilities