UT HB0327 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Autism Awareness Support Special Group License Plate
Title
Autism Awareness Support Special Group License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-03-01 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-23 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-23 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |