UT HB0325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Fuel Marketing Act Reauthorization
Title
Motor Fuel Marketing Act Reauthorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House/ failed (Y: 35 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House/ failed (Y: 35 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-07 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-02-29 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-29 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-29 | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-29 | House/ motion to reconsider passed in HCLERK | |
2012-02-29 | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK | |
2012-02-28 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-02-28 | House/ failed in HCLERK | |
2012-02-28 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-21 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-21 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-17 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-15 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-07 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-03 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-03 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-02 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |