UT HB0318 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher Education Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 40 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-09 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-09 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-19SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-19SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee
2021-02-16HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee
2021-02-12HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53B1112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B1114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B1115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B1402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B1408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B1503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B16101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B16201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B16205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B16207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B16209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B16211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B2102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B2103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B2104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B2105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B2106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B26102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B28402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B6105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B7103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B7105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53B8115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53E3507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63N12501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0318.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0318.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0318S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0318S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillenr/HB0318.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0318S01_ComparedWith_HB0318.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0318S02_ComparedWith_HB0318S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0318S03_ComparedWith_HB0318S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0318S03.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19638
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=587&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=588&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20262
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1558&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1275&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback