UT HB0303S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driving Under the Influence Amendments
Title
Driving Under the Influence Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTLAW |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2014-02-17 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTLAW |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0303 (Replaces) 2014-02-21 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB