UT HB0284 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum Wage Amendments
Title
Minimum Wage Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Comm - Tabled (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ commrpt/ sent to Rules/bill tabled in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House Comm - Not Lifted from Table in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | House Comm - Tabled in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 40 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 40 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |