UT HB0273 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condominium Association Amendments
Title
Condominium Association Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2016-03-16 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2016-03-15 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-07 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2016-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ uncircled in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ circled in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-04 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |