UT HB0257 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Treasurer Amendments
Title
State Treasurer Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-02-25 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-22 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-22 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-02-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-02-22 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTGOP |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2013-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-02-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTREV |
2013-02-06 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTREV |
2013-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2013-02-04 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTREV |
2013-01-30 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTREV |
2013-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK |
2013-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCLERK |
2013-01-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-24 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |