UT HB0256 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farm to School Program
Title
Farm to School Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-06 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Agriculture and Food
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Health
Education
Health
K-12 Education
State Board of Education
Student health and safety
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Health
Education
Health
K-12 Education
State Board of Education
Student health and safety