UT HB0229 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Water Right General Adjudication Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Right General Adjudication Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2010-03-18 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2010-02-19 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-02-19 House/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2010-02-19 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2010-02-19 Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON
2010-02-16 Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTNAE
2010-02-12 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE
2010-02-09 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-02-08 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2010-02-08 House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB
2010-02-01 House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2010-01-29 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE
2010-01-26 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL
2010-01-25 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2010-01-25 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2010-01-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-01-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback