UT HB0228 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0228S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | House | House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0228S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-12 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0228.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0228.pdf |