UT HB0228 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Source Amendments
Title
Renewable Energy Source Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-12 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-12 | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in HSPEC | |
2010-02-04 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-04 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2010-01-25 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |