UT HB0216 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Wholesome Food Act Revisions
Title
Utah Wholesome Food Act Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |