UT HB0207 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
License Plate Placement Amendments
Title
License Plate Placement Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Transportation Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |