UT HB0204S03 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0204S04
Note: Replaces legislation HB0204S01
Note: Replaces legislation HB0204S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Election Amendments
Title
Election Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-25 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2013-02-22 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in HSTPOL |
2013-02-19 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2013-02-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2013-02-19 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTPOL |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTPOL |
2013-02-14 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTPOL |
2013-02-14 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL |
2013-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0204S04 (Replaced by) 2013-03-06 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
HB0204S01 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - House/ substituted in HSUB
HB0204S01 (Replaces) 2013-02-28 - House/ substituted in HSUB