UT HB0198 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

License Plates Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House/ failed (Y: 36 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Transportation Committee
2021-01-27HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
2021-01-27HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Transportation Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-01-22HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-01-22HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-19 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-19 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback