UT HB0178 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legal Notice Amendments
Title
Legal Notice Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Chew [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |