UT HB0173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dedication and Abandonment of Public Highways
Title
Dedication and Abandonment of Public Highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-04 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-23 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-23 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-16 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-15 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-08 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-07 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |