UT HB0160S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0160
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health System Reform Amendments
Title
Health System Reform Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCON |
2013-03-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCON |
2013-03-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCON |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in HSTBUS |
2013-03-06 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-05 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTBUS |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0160 (Replaces) 2013-03-07 - House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in HSUB