UT HB0158S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0158
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Credit Protection Amendments
Title
Consumer Credit Protection Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] | Sen. Patricia Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ to House in SSEC |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTREV |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTLAW |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTLAW |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-22 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0158 (Replaces) 2013-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB