UT HB0146 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Overdose Harm Reduction Working Group
Title
Overdose Harm Reduction Working Group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill Substituted by Sponsor in House Rules Comm from # 0 to # 1 in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business Licensing
Counties
Health
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Counties
Health
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment