UT HB0139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0139S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Action Center
Title
Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Action Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2013-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTEDW |
2013-02-20 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDW |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0139S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB