UT HB0139S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0139
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0139S05
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0139S05
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Action Center
Title
Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Action Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTEDU |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTEDU |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTEDW |
2013-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTEDW |
2013-02-20 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDW |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDW |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0139 (Replaces) 2013-02-25 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
HB0139S05 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
HB0139S05 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV