UT HB0132 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pioneer Trail Memorial Highway
Title
Pioneer Trail Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-17 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-19 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-19 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-16 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-12 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |