UT HB0131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0131S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional and Federalism Defense Act
Title
Constitutional and Federalism Defense Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ivory [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0131S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0131.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0131.pdf |