UT HB0118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Development Incentives Modifications
Title
Economic Development Incentives Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ lifted from table in S3RDTA | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-17 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-08 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-05 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-02 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-29 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |