UT HB0112S09 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0112S04
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0112S10
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0112S10
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of Electronic Cigarettes
Title
Regulation of Electronic Cigarettes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ substituted (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ substituted (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-03-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTBUS |
2014-03-10 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTBUS |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTHHS |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTHHS |
2014-02-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2014-02-19 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0112S04 (Replaces) 2014-03-11 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
HB0112S10 (Replaced by) 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
HB0112S10 (Replaced by) 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE