UT HB0112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Payments for State Care of Children
Title
Payments for State Care of Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-03-14 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-13 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-09 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | House Comm - Held in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |