UT HB0092 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Moist Snuff Taxation Revisions
Title
Moist Snuff Taxation Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2010-02-16 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-20 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0092.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0092.pdf |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillamd/hb0092.pdf |