UT HB0086 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm Reporting Requirements
Title
Firearm Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2023-02-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-03 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-22 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Background Checks
Bureau of Criminal Investigation
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Weapons
Bureau of Criminal Investigation
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 10 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 10 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |