UT HB0054 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Revisions
Title
Tax Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-02 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-02 | Senate | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Senate President |
2023-03-02 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 3 to # 4 in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-02 | Senate | House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-02 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 10 | 1018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 1042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 1044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 7 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 7 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 7 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |