UT HB0051 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Specialty Practice Act Amendments
Title
Medical Specialty Practice Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-15 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-15 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-15 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-02-14 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-14 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2012-02-13 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2012-02-13 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-07 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-07 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-03 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-02-01 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-01-30 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-01-30 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-30 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-25 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-25 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTHHS | |
2012-01-24 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2012-01-24 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTHHS | |
2012-01-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |