UT HB0047S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0047S02
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0047S02
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0047S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Law Amendments
Title
Insurance Law Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2013-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2013-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-07 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2012-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0047S02 (Replaced by) 2013-02-21 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
HB0047S02 (Replaced by) 2013-02-07 - House/ substituted in HSUB
HB0047S02 (Replaced by) 2013-02-07 - House/ substituted in HSUB