UT HB0039S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0039
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Candidate Amendments
Title
Candidate Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House/ failed (Y: 16 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House/ failed (Y: 16 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-22 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-07 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-07 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTGOP |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2013-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2013-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-13 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ failed in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2012-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0039 (Replaces) 2013-02-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB