UT HB0036 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Telehealth Mental Health Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth Mental Health Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-10SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-20SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-20SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-19SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-01-19SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-16 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62A15114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1262Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback