UT HB0032 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Worker Protection Amendments
Title
Health Care Worker Protection Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-18 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-15 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-15 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-15 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Assault and Battery
Crimes
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Labor and Employment
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Operations
Sunsets and Repealers
Workplace Safety and Health
Crimes
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Labor and Employment
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Operations
Sunsets and Repealers
Workplace Safety and Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63I | 2 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |