UT HB0024S02 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0024S01
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0024S03
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0024S03
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Related Amendments
Title
Insurance Related Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in SSEC |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-11 | House | Governor Returned Legislation to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2014-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCURCAL |
2014-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCURCAL |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from table in S3RDTA |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in S3RDTA |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-12 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTBUS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTBUS |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDHB |
2014-01-29 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-01-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDHB |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2013-12-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0024S01 (Replaces) 2014-02-11 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
HB0024S03 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
HB0024S03 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV