UT HB0009 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by HB0009S02

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue Bond and Capital Facilities Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue Bond and Capital Facilities Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ substituted in HSUB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in H3RDHB
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-03-07HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2014-03-07HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2014-03-07HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-03-07HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-03-07 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2014-03-07 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-03-07 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2013-09-04 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0009S02 (Replaced by) 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback