UT HB0006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement and Independent Entities Base Budget
Title
Retirement and Independent Entities Base Budget
Sponsors
Sen. Don Ipson [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-02-03 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-02-03 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-01 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-31 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-01-31 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-01-31 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-01-31 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-25 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-25 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-24 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-24 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-01-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-20 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-01-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |