US SR868 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month" in order to educate communities across the United States about sickle cell disease and the need for research, early detection methods, effective treatments, and preventative care programs with respect to complications from sickle cell disease and conditions related to sickle cell disease.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month" in order to educate communities across the United States about sickle cell disease and the need for research, early detection methods, effective treatments, and preventative care programs with respect to complications from sickle cell disease and conditions related to sickle cell disease.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075) |
Same As/Similar To
HR494 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1330 (Related) 2022-09-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR477 (Same As) 2021-12-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9126; text: CR S9124-9125)
HR1330 (Related) 2022-09-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR477 (Same As) 2021-12-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9126; text: CR S9124-9125)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/868/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres868/BILLS-117sres868ats.pdf |