US HR494 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 2021 as "Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month" in order to educate communities across the United States about sickle cell disease and the need for research, early detection methods, effective treatments, and preventative care programs with respect to complications from sickle cell disease and conditions related to sickle cell disease.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2021 as "Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month" in order to educate communities across the United States about sickle cell disease and the need for research, early detection methods, effective treatments, and preventative care programs with respect to complications from sickle cell disease and conditions related to sickle cell disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR477 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9126; text: CR S9124-9125)
HR1330 (Related) 2022-09-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR868 (Related) 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075)
HR1330 (Related) 2022-09-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR868 (Related) 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084; text: CR S7074-7075)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/494/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres494/BILLS-117hres494ih.pdf |