US SR826 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: 10/11/2022 CR S6473)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: 10/11/2022 CR S6473)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 26, 2022, as the "Day of the Deployed".
Title
A resolution designating October 26, 2022, as the "Day of the Deployed".
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: 10/11/2022 CR S6473) |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR429 (Related) 2021-10-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7432-7433; text: CR S7418-7419)