US SR429 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7432-7433; text: CR S7418-7419)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7432-7433; text: CR S7418-7419)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 26, 2021, as the "Day of the Deployed".
Title
A resolution designating October 26, 2021, as the "Day of the Deployed".
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7432-7433; text: CR S7418-7419) |
Same As/Similar To
SR826 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: 10/11/2022 CR S6473)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/429/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres429/BILLS-117sres429ats.pdf |