US SR81 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/1/2021 CR S958-959)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/1/2021 CR S958-959)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution honoring Las Damas de Blanco, a women-led nonviolent movement in support of freedom and human rights in Cuba, and calling for the release of all political prisoners in Cuba.
Title
A resolution honoring Las Damas de Blanco, a women-led nonviolent movement in support of freedom and human rights in Cuba, and calling for the release of all political prisoners in Cuba.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2494; text: 3/1/2021 CR S958-959) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 18. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |