US SR772 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the seriousness of myotonic dystrophy and expressing support for the designation of September 15, 2022, as "International Myotonic Dystrophy Awareness Day".
Title
A resolution recognizing the seriousness of myotonic dystrophy and expressing support for the designation of September 15, 2022, as "International Myotonic Dystrophy Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6052; text: 09/19/2022 CR S4824-4825) |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SR336 (Related) 2021-08-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5836)